skip to content

Kading, Adam Richard

CPSO#: 98332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southampton Hospital
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: 5197973230 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adam Kading Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM RICHARD KADING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014