skip to content

Kadic-Mucevic, Edina

CPSO#: 86040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

6981 Millcreek Drive - Unit 2
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Canada
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

701 Main Street West - Unit 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 768-7246
Fax: (289) 779-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edina Kadic-Mucevic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kadic-Mucevic ( CPSO# 86040 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone Number: (289) 724-7246

Business Address:
Suite 100
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDINA KADIC-MUCEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADIC-MUCEVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2008