skip to content

Kachooie, Sogoal

CPSO#: 93885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Sydney, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10660 Yonge St, Units 2 & 3
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: 905-770-9096 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 770-4703 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1911 Kennedy Road
Suite 200
Scarborough ON  M1P2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 299-3800
Fax: (416) 299-6025
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Kachooie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kachooie ( CPSO# 93885 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1911 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 299-3800

Business Address:
10660 Yonge Street
Units 2 & 3
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOGOAL KACHOOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHOOIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015