skip to content

Kabbani, Dima

CPSO#: 99196

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Sep 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Kabbani, Dima Marwan (used until: 29 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11350 83 Avenue
1-124 Clinical Sciences Building
Edmonton AB  T6G 2G3
Phone: (780) 492-9418
Fax: 780-492-8050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 20 Mar 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active
             Dr. Dima Kabbani may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases.