skip to content

Kaasa, Benjamin Michael

CPSO#: 86729

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Phone: 4166035888 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benjamin Kaasa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaasa ( CPSO# 86729 )

Business Address:
Suite 2W - 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
3rd Floor
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Phone Number: 416-603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL KAASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAASA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009