skip to content

Velji, Karim

CPSO#: 114099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 - 3770 Montrose Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 3K3
Phone: (905) 354-3777
Fax: (905) 378-3358 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Azim M. Velji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Velji ( CPSO# 30617 )
Dr. K. Velji ( CPSO# 114099)

Business Address:
5-3770 Montrose Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 3K3


Corporation Name: Karim Velji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Velji ( CPSO# 114099)

Business Address:
5-3770 Montrose Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 3K3
Phone Number: (905) 354-3777


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Oct 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019 Active
             Dr. Karim Velji may practise medicine independently in family medicine.