skip to content

Siu, Kaitlyn Victoria

CPSO#: 95384

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Turnbull, Kaitlyn Victoria (used until: 08 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thorold Family Health Centre
21 Front Street S
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone: (905) 688-6440
Fax: 905 687 1855 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2X 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Siu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Siu ( CPSO# 95211 )
Dr. K. Siu ( CPSO# 95384 )

Business Address:
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 357-3644

Business Address:
21 Front Street South
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 688-6460

Business Address:
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAITLYN VICTORIA SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017