skip to content

Reynolds, Katelyn Bret

CPSO#: 98472

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
5 East 5-105-01
550 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 3027
Fax: 416-597-1074 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reynolds & Toupin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Toupin ( CPSO# 98382 )
Dr. K. Reynolds ( CPSO# 98472 )

Business Address:
Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 626-2138

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
5th Floor, Room S - 105-01
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-1074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATELYN BRET REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018