skip to content

Pilon-Larose, Karine

CPSO#: 100184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Suite 300, 100 Marie-Curie private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luis Rivero Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivero Lopez ( CPSO# 96339 )
Dr. K. Pilon-Larose ( CPSO# 100184)

Business Address:
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARINE PILON-LAROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON-LAROSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016