skip to content

Moran, Keith Wilson Valentine

CPSO#: 62621

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 Hiram St
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone: 7056461221
Fax: 7056461271 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran ( CPSO# 62621 )

Business Address:
169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone Number: (705) 646-1221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 18, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
By way of letter dated February 18, 2021, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on January 22, 2021 Dr. Keith Moran tendered his resignation, effective for April 5, 2021, after the Credentials Committee of the hospital expressed reservations about recommending Dr. Moran’s re-appointment to the credentialed staff. It is believed that Dr. Moran’s resignation is related to allegations of unprofessional conduct.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEITH WILSON VALENTINE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1992