skip to content

Millitz, Kip

CPSO#: 63758

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Imaging Department
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Fax: (705) 743-1713 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Millitz/Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peters ( CPSO# 59499 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )
Dr. S. Zaheer ( CPSO# 95170 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIP MILLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992