skip to content

Lai, Kevin Chi Yan

CPSO#: 82938

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Get Well Clinic
649 Sheppard Ave West
Toronto ON  M3H 2S4
Phone: (416) 508-5691
Fax: (647) 478-7604 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Lai and Dr. M. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lai ( CPSO# 29179 )
Dr. A. Lai ( CPSO# 29947 )
Dr. K. Lai ( CPSO# 82938 )

Business Address:
347 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2G3
Phone Number: (416) 977-1560


Corporation Name: Kevin Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lai ( CPSO# 82938 )

Business Address:
53 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 222-5417

Business Address:
649 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2S4
Phone Number: (416) 508-5691

Business Address:
59 Adelaide Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 591-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHI YAN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007