skip to content

Komsa, Kendra Rose

CPSO#: 106924

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G3H1
Phone: 226-476-0459
Fax: 226-215-3193 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. B. Girardi & K. Komsa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Girardi ( CPSO# 95382 )
Dr. K. Komsa ( CPSO# 106924)

Business Address:
MSK Centre
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Business Address:
MSK Centre
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Business Address:
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Mississauga ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Mississauga ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
B-51 Benton St
KW PEDSCARE
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1

Business Address:
B-51 Benton St
KW PEDSCARE
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENDRA ROSE KOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2019