skip to content

Hack, Kalesha

CPSO#: 81145

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
M6 252 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2310 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Corporation Name: Sebastian Rodriguez-Elizalde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rodriguez-Elizalde ( CPSO# 81389 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )

Business Address:
3695 Keele Street
North York ON  M3K 1E5
Phone Number: (416) 636-8626


Corporation Name: Kalesha Hack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rodriguez-Elizalde ( CPSO# 81389 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M6 252 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KALESHA HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009