skip to content

Grewal, Karen Kaur

CPSO#: 90514

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
722-115 Humber College Blvd
Pediatrics at Humber College
Phone: 416-743-6063
Fax: 416-743-0101

Additional Practice Location(s)

11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Canada
Phone: 905-497-7779
Fax: 905-497-7707
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen K. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grewal ( CPSO# 90514 )

Business Address:
722-115 Humber College Blvd
Pediatrics at Humber College
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: 416-743-6063

Business Address:
11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: 905-497-7779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013