skip to content

Ghatavi, Kayhan Reza

CPSO#: 71668

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harvie Ghatavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ghatavi ( CPSO# 71668 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAYHAN REZA GHATAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007