skip to content

Gammon, Kristy Lee

CPSO#: 58233

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
P O Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: (705) 457-3955 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: K. Gammon & S. Ferracuti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. S. Ferracuti ( CPSO# 58446 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands Health Services
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTY LEE GAMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988