skip to content

Jurencak, Roman

CPSO#: 85175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Slovak

Education:Masaryk University in Brno, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatric Rheumatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1015
Fax: (613) 738-4297 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jurencak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jurencak ( CPSO# 85175 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern of Ontario
Division of Paediatric Rheumatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Nov 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active
 Dr.   Roman   Jurencak   may  practise  medicine  independently  in  paediatric
            rheumatology.