skip to content

Junqueira-Duarte, Beatriz Lasmar Portilho

CPSO#: 93836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Estacio de Sa (Unesa), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 3339 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. Beatriz Junqueira-Duarte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEATRIZ LASMAR PORTILHO JUNQUEIRA-DUARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNQUEIRA-DUARTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015