skip to content

Jung, Michelle Mihye

CPSO#: 93226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2017