skip to content

Jumah, Naana Afua

CPSO#: 89225

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807)6990692
Fax: 8076225686 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naana Afua Jumah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jumah ( CPSO# 89225 )

Business Address:
63 Algoma Street North
Suite 410
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 699-0692

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAANA AFUA JUMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUMAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013