skip to content

Juma, Zulfikar Amirali Hassan

CPSO#: 28082

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zulfikar Juma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:26 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2020