Julien, Francois (CPSO#: 101117)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2015