skip to content

Jugenburg, Martin

CPSO#: 86140

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 27 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Jugenburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jugenburg ( CPSO# 86140 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
The Fairmont Royal York Hotel
100 Front Street West
Level B
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 834-6640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 May 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 27 May 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 May 2021
Summary:

On February 1 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
 an allegation of Dr. Jugenburg’s professional misconduct. Images of Patient C, which 
 were of a sensitive and personal nature, were posted on Dr. Jugenburg’s clinic website 
 without her consent and remained on the website for over five years.  
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Jugenburg and his counsel, and counsel 
for the College. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts on Liability, the 
 Committee found that Dr. Jugenburg had committed an act of professional misconduct 
 in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 Combined proceedings 
 An order pursuant to section 9.1(1)(a) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act combined 
 the hearing of liability and penalty in this matter (with respect to Patient C) with hearing 
 of penalty against Dr. Jugenburg with respect to a previous matter involving other 
 patients (Patients A and B), where the Committee had determined liability in September 
 2020. 
 Penalty 
  
 Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, the Committee ordered 
 and directed on the combined matters that: 
  
    •  Dr. Jugenburg attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
    •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Jugenburg’s certificate of registration for six months, 
       commencing 30 days after the date of the order; 
    •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Jugenburg’s 
       certificate of registration, as set out in the order; 
    •  Dr. Jugenburg pay costs to the College in the amount of $31,110. 
  
 The Committee’s full reasons for decision are available for review on the College’s 
 website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 1, 2021

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Sep 2020
Summary:

In June 2020, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
allegations of Dr. Jugenburg’s professional misconduct. Dr. Jugenburg had permitted a 
television crew to film a patient’s surgical procedure without her informed consent, 
which resulted in a major breach of her privacy. He had failed to ensure the privacy of 
another patient as a result of the inadvertent posting of her images on social media on 
two occasions. He also failed to consider adequately the privacy interests of the 
patients of his clinic, over a two-year period, through the design and operation of the 
clinic’s video surveillance system. 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Jugenburg and his counsel, and counsel 
for the College.  
In its decision released in September 2020, taking into account an Agreed Statement of 
Facts, the Committee found that Dr. Jugenburg had committed committed an act of 
professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1) 33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made 
under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
Combined proceedings 
 
An order pursuant to section 9.1(1)(a) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act combined 
the hearing of penalty in this matter (with respect to Patients A and B) with the hearing 
of allegations and determination of penalty against Dr. Jugenburg regarding another 
patient, Patient C, into a single proceeding, held on February 1, 2021 via 
videoconference. 
 
Penalty 
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, the Committee ordered 
and directed on the combined matters that: 
 
   •  Dr. Jugenburg attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
   •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Jugenburg’s certificate of registration for six months, 
      commencing 30 days after the date of the order; 
   •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Jugenburg’s 
      certificate of registration, as set out in the order; 
   •  Dr. Jugenburg pay costs to the College in the amount of $31,110. 
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision are available for review on the College’s 
website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 17 - 19, 2020; June 24 - 26, 2020 Penalty Hearing: February 1, 2021

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 3, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: February 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Martin Jugenburg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2019:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Jugenburg’s use of security cameras and video surveillance recording devices in his practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Jugenburg has undertaken to:

(i) As soon as any security cameras or video surveillance recording devices are operational in his practices, he will post a sign in the entrance way(s) and waiting room(s) in each and every location where he practises, in a clearly visible and secure location, in any languages in which he provides services, notifying patients that the premises are monitored by video surveillance; and

(ii) Effective immediately, he will ensure that in each and every location where he practises, there are no security cameras or video surveillance recording devices in any areas where patient encounters occur or may occur, which involve or may involve patients moving or removing clothing. These areas include but are not limited to all examination rooms, consultation rooms, operating rooms, etc.