skip to content

Juergens, Rosalyn Anne

CPSO#: 94794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Georgetown University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:26 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active
 Dr.  Rosalyn Anne Juergens may practise medicine independently in medical
                  oncology, only.