skip to content

Luu, Judy Mai

CPSO#: 108493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Cardiology Clinic
Cardiology
Suite 205
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C1
Phone: (905-648-6883
Fax: 905-648-1288 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:15 Sep 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUDY MAI LUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021