skip to content

Jrearz, Ricky

CPSO#: 97701

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Specialist Clinic
Suite 134
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 938-5648
Fax: (905) 584-6877 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Jrearz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jrearz ( CPSO# 97701 )

Business Address:
134-150 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 938-5648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICKY JREARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JREARZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017