skip to content

Joyner, Duncan Campbell

CPSO#: 31413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Apr 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804748
Fax: 4164806856 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 4022
3080 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 647 347 6644
Fax: 647 347 6647
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.C. Joyner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUNCAN CAMPBELL JOYNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1980