skip to content

Jovaisas, Algis Vladas

CPSO#: 29977

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 508
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 233-7426
Fax: (613) 233-9912 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Algis V. Jovaisas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jovaisas ( CPSO# 29977 )

Business Address:
Suite 508
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 233-7426

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALGIS VLADAS JOVAISAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOVAISAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978