skip to content

Josse, Robert Gerald

CPSO#: 29037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Apr 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7455
Fax: (416) 867-3696 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 416 3505995
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert G. Josse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Josse ( CPSO# 29037 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT GERALD JOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1977