skip to content

Josse, Jonathan Michael

CPSO#: 101283

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018