skip to content

Hwang, Joshua

CPSO#: 111009

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 1, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 12, 2017, London Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Joshua Hwang's Privileges were suspended, effective September 1, 2017.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Jun 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jun 2019
Summary:

On June 17, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joshua Wang committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that:  he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician; and, 
he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. 
 
Dr. Joshua Hwang is 32 years old. He graduated with an M.D. from Western University Schulich School of 
Medicine and Dentistry in 2016. Between October 2016 and July 2017, Dr. Hwang was a PGY1 resident 
in the Family Medicine residency training program at Western University. He had a certificate of 
registration authorizing postgraduate education. On July 1, 2017, Dr. Hwang was placed on a leave of 
absence from his residency program. On August 24, 2017, Dr. Hwang was suspended from that program, 
and was never reinstated. Dr. Hwang’s certificate of registration expired on June 30, 2018. 
 
CPSO Investigation 
 
In June 2017, Dr. Hwang was living in London, Ontario. On June 21, 2017, Dr. Hwang travelled to attend 
a conference in a different city. He made arrangements to stay with two of his friends, Dr. A and his 
wife, Dr. B, at their apartment. 
 
Dr. A and B’s apartment had 2 bedrooms and 2 bathrooms. Dr. A and B used the master bedroom and 
en suite master bathroom. Dr. Hwang was given the guestroom to stay in, and a separate bathroom in 
the common area to use. 
 
On June 21, 2017, Dr. Hwang installed a video and audio recording device (“the Recording Device”) in his 
friends’ en suite master bathroom by plugging it into an electrical wall outlet facing their shower and 
toilet. The Recording Device was concealed as a USB charger. Using the Recording Device, Dr. Hwang 
surreptitiously recorded Drs. A and B naked and partially naked in their bathroom, including when they 
were using the toilet and showering. 
 
After Dr. B noticed the Recording Device plugged into the electrical outlet in the en suite bathroom, Dr. 
A questioned Dr. Hwang about it. Dr. Hwang acknowledged that the Recording Device belonged to him, 
but falsely denied knowing that it was a camera or that it had recording capabilities. Dr. Hwang told Dr. 
A that he thought the Recording Device was merely a USB charger; that he had purchased it on the 
internet; that he had been trying to use it to charge his cell phone; but that he had had to plug it in in 
the en suite master bathroom because it had not been working in other outlets in his friends’ 
apartment. This explanation was false. 
 
Dr. Hwang also falsely told Dr. A that he could provide an e-mail receipt to prove that the device he had 
ordered was supposed to be a USB charger. Dr. Hwang forwarded to Dr. A an email receipt dated 
November 30, 2012 that related to Dr. Hwang’s purchase of a USB wall charger. The USB wall charger 
that Dr. Hwang had purchased was not the Recording Device that Dr. Hwang installed in his friends’ en 
suite bathroom in June 2017 that he had used to surreptitiously record them. 
 
In addition to surreptitiously video recording Drs. A and B in their bathroom, Dr. Hwang also used the 
Recording Device to surreptitiously record: 
 
-  a clinical encounter between Dr. Hwang and a female patient, taken on June 19, 2017, at clinic 
   where Dr. Hwang was practicing as part of his residency. The camera was positioned to face the 
   exam table. The patient was off camera during most of the encounter. Dr. Hwang is visible 
   throughout the recordings. Dr. Hwang can be seen taking the patient’s blood pressure reading, and 
   speaking to the patient. Another video captures further discussion between Dr. Hwang and the 
   patient. Dr. Hwang can also be seen removing the camera from the electrical wall outlet. The patient 
   was unaware that Dr. Hwang had recorded her patient encounter. She did not consent to Dr. 
   Hwang’s recording the appointment; and 
-  two females in bedrooms in Dr. Hwang’s home. Both of them were, at times, in a state of nudity. In 
   one of the recordings, a female was engaged in intimate sexual activity. The recordings were made 
   surreptitiously. Neither of these two individuals was aware that Dr. Hwang video recorded them, 
   nor did they consent to the recording. One of the individuals described it as an “invasion of privacy” 
   when she was told of the recording. 
       
Dr. Hwang made the recordings referred to above so that he could later watch them for his sexual 
gratification. 
 
Criminal Proceedings 
 
On August 4, 2017, Dr. Hwang was charged with committing voyeurism against Drs. A and B, contrary to 
s. 162 of the Criminal Code of Canada, and specifically that: 
    
   on or about the 21st day of June in the year 2017 at the City of Ottawa in the East/De L’Est Region 
   did, without lawful excuse, surreptitiously make a visual recording of a person who was in 
   circumstances that gave rise to a reasonable expectation of privacy when that person was in a place 
   in which that person could reasonably be expected to be nude, to be exposing his or her genital 
   organs or anal region or exposing her breasts or be engaged in explicit sexual activity, namely the 
   victim’s bathroom, and thereby commit an offence under Section 162, subsection (1), clause (a) of 
   the Criminal Code, contrary Section 162, subsection (5) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
 
A copy of the criminal information is attached at Tab 1 to the Statement of Uncontested Facts. 
 
Dr. Hwang pleaded guilty to, and was convicted, of this offence on February 17, 2018. On June 29, 2018, 
Dr. Hwang was sentenced to six months’ house arrest, followed by two years’ probation. The Ontario 
Court of Justice transcripts of Dr. Hwang’s conviction and sentencing are attached at Tabs 2 and 3 to the 
Statement of Uncontested Facts 
 
Disposition 
 
On June 17, 2019, the Committee ordered that: 
 
-  The Registrar revoke Dr. Hwang’s certificate of registration effective immediately. 
-  Dr. Hwang attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Hwang pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within six (6) months from the date 
   of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): June 17, 2019 half day commencing at 9:00 a.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: October 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s)

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College. The following sets out findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On February 7, 2018, Joshua Hwang pleaded guilty to voyeurism under Section 162(1a) of the Criminal Code of Canada, contrary to Section 162(5) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

On June 29, 2018, Dr. Hwang was sentenced to six months’ jail to be served in the community under terms set out in the Conditional Sentence Order (see PDF), followed by 2 years probation, and a victim surcharge of $100.
Download Full Document (PDF)