Joshi, Vishal (CPSO#: 97481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Lakeridge Health
Department of Infectious Diseases
580 Harwood Ave S.
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge and Scarborough Hospital
Dept of Medicine/Infectious Disease
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vishal Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi ( CPSO# 97481 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Infectious Diseases
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Pickering ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Rouge Valley Centenary
Department of Infectious Diseases
2867 Ellesmere Street
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vishal  Joshi may practice medicine independently in internal medicine and
            infectious diseases, only.