skip to content

Joshi, Sapna

CPSO#: 93622

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Jha, Sapna (used until: 15 Oct 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
906 Brant Street Suite 202
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Phone: 905-631-8700 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sapna Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 93622 )

Business Address:
202 - 906 Brant St.
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 631-8700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAPNA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012