skip to content

Joshi, Rohit

CPSO#: 90594

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-3042 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

MyHealth Centre Diagnostic Imaging
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: 18882269989
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

MyHealth Centre Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 212
480 Bronte Street South
Mississauga ON  L9T2X6
Canada
Phone: 18883022566
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hitek Medical Imaging
Suite 5
5801 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M3T9
Canada
Phone: 4162226989
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hitek Medical Imaging
Lower Level
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J2K9
Canada
Phone: 4164931011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Queensway Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C1A5
Canada
Phone: 4162596671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Joshi ( CPSO# 90594 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Suite 5
5801 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9

Business Address:
Lower Level
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROHIT JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014