skip to content

Joshi, Arvind Kumar

CPSO#: 27987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4605 Miller Avenue, Montreal, QC H3W 2E4
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015