skip to content

Joseph, Steven Randall

CPSO#: 91324

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sports Med Clinic
3M Centre
1151 Richmond Street
Western University
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64944
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

South Huron Hospital
24 Huron St W
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Canada
Phone: 5192352700
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. R. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joseph ( CPSO# 91324 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sports Medical Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3011

Business Address:
J1004 - 1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Phone Number: (519) 452-4230

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph Hospital
D0-101
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6081

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN RANDALL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2015