skip to content

Di Stefano, Joseph Matthew

CPSO#: 77682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General and Marine Hosp
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Distefano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MATTHEW DI STEFANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI STEFANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004