skip to content

Joseph, Llewellyn Winston

CPSO#: 29549

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 11-Oct-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Llewellyn Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre 596 Davis Drive Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9 Tel: (905) 895-4521
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017