skip to content

Joseph, Jay Ashvin

CPSO#: 93605

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.A. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021
Corporation Name: J.A. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joseph ( CPSO# 93605 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:22 Mar 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2021 Active
 1. Dr. JAY ASHVIN JOSEPH may practise physical medicine and rehabilitation with Lakeridge Health in Oshawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on 31 August, 2021. 
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. JOSEPH's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. JOSEPH's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 March, 2021, and will expire on or before 31 August, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.