skip to content

Joo, Daniel Adam

CPSO#: 100026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel Joo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 9 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic and General Campuses
Instructions: Records available at both campuses
Date Received: 16 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2014