skip to content

Jong, Winston Melvyn

CPSO#: 22136

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Winston M. Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 2180 Meadowvale Blvd Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Date Received: 22 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019