skip to content

Jong, Roberta Agnes

CPSO#: 23271

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Nov 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
M6-258 Department Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4355
Fax: (416) 480-5266 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M6-258 Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4355


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERTA AGNES JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1970