skip to content

Jones, Paul Bernard

CPSO#: 95530

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Jones, Paul (used until: 07 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arthur Family Practice Associates
110 Charles St East
Arthur ON  N0G 1A0
Phone: (519) 8483798
Fax: 5198486373 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

110 Charles St E
Arthur ON  N0G 1A0
Canada
Phone: 519-848-3798
Fax: 519-848-6373
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union St E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul B. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jones ( CPSO# 95530 )

Business Address:
Guelph Emergency Medical Services
Guelph General Hospital
103 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Business Address:
110 Charles Street East
Arthur ON  N0G 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 848-3798

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL BERNARD JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013