skip to content

Jones, Mara

CPSO#: 88816

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3695 Keele St
Toronto ON  M3J1N2
Canada
Phone: 6473477218
Fax: 4163525123
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARA JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013