skip to content

Jones, Jennifer Kathleen

CPSO#: 88611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 664-3730
Fax: (905) 664-9921 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer K. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 88611 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 664-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHLEEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010