skip to content

Jomphe, Michele

CPSO#: 94285

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 5194644400 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1405 Edward St
BOX 8000
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 3722944
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot W St
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

421 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON  P0J1P0
Canada
Phone: 7056478121
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle de Medecine Michele Jomphe
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jomphe ( CPSO# 94285 )

Business Address:
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: 5194644400

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex Alliance Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELE JOMPHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOMPHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010