skip to content

Jolly, Donald Thomas

CPSO#: 30644

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Misericordia Hospital and Community Health Centre 16940 87 Avenue Edmonton, AB T5R 4H5
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016