skip to content

Jolliffe, Courtney Jane

CPSO#: 93423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jolliffe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jolliffe ( CPSO# 93423 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C E7

Business Address:
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: 4174619471

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
406 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-1600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY JANE JOLLIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLIFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015