skip to content

Johnston, William Hunter

CPSO#: 31615

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Dundas St E
Unit 5
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Phone: 8883502323 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: 8074689861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Johnston ( CPSO# 31615 )

Business Address:
55 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 750-3513

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HUNTER JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980